Trustees 1ST GOTHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1184237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chris Wilson Chair 06 July 2024
None on record
ANGELA MERYL JOLLIFFE Trustee 06 July 2024
None on record
Alison Moreman Trustee 07 July 2023
None on record
Katherine Strachan Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Clare Brazil Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Neil Thorley Trustee 14 September 2022
GOTHAM PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Received: On time
Ben Anderson Trustee 01 August 2022
THE MANCHESTER YOUNG PEOPLE'S THEATRE LIMITED
Received: On time
Simon Pank Trustee 07 July 2022
None on record