Financial history TEMPLE BAR TRUST

Charity Number: 1185076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £120.92k £13.64k £145.01k £136.55k £194.20k
Total expenditure £13.75k £19.98k £220.11k £130.41k £133.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £50.00k N/A