SING YOUR HEART OUT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sing Your Heart out promotes good mental health and wellbeing through singing workshops that enable participants to reap the known benefits of group singing in harmony. The sessions are designed so that people who might normally feel unable to join more formal choir settings (often through mental ill health) can participate without discrimination or judgement, and also benefit socially.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 August 2019: CIO registration
- SYHO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Christine Rumsby | Chair | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cherri Diane Moseley | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Marilyn Forde | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil White | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Emerson | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Penelope Holden | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Jane Ford | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Weston Wheeler | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Janice Bain | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.40k | £4.33k | £31.64k | £31.75k | £26.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.30k | £10.81k | £20.19k | £33.25k | £32.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.48k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ARTS BASED ACTIVITIES; SPECIFICALLY GROUP SINGING IN HARMONY. TO REDUCE THE ISOLATION, STIGMA AND DISCRIMINATION EXPERIENCED BY THOSE EXPERIENCING MENTAL ILL HEALTH AND TO PROMOTE IMPROVED SELF-ESTEEM AND CONFIDENCE. TO PROMOTE, EDUCATE AND INFORM PEOPLE ABOUT THE BENEFITS OF ARTS BASED ACTIVITIES IN IMPROVING MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 The Street
Sparham
Norwich
NR9 5AQ
- Phone:
- 01603409419
- Email:
- singing@syho.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window