THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Methodist Church Barnsley North East seeks to share the gospel of Christ in the communities it serves. It maintains a Christian presence in the communities of Hemsworth, Brierley, Ryhill, Cudworth, Monk Bretton, Athersley (New Hope) and Staincross/Mapplewell by holding weekly Christian worship, groups to study the bible & Christian principles and running activities to support the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

25 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
Governance
- 14 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Claire Elizabeth Rawlinson | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
DAPHNE IRWIN | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Marilyn Corney | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Naylor | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard William Caley | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|||||||
GLORIA BOOTH | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Deborah Wendy Charrington-Caley | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN BELLAMY | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Stanley Corney | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Joyce Stammers | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
John Barrie Broadhurst | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Susan Mellor | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
FRED LANDON | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Chene Makumbe | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Morris | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Houghton | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Reed | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Sheila Margaret Stather | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Jean Rowley | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Frederick Hollands | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Michael Anthony Neal | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Dianne Charlesworth | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
ELIZABETH ANN HAIGH | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Ann Hambleton | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
HEATHER SHEILA HAGUE BSC HONS | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £364.94k | £258.49k | £219.48k | £226.00k | £185.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.66k | £156.34k | £240.81k | £259.29k | £200.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.45k | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel Methodist Church
72 Huddersfield Road
Barnsley
S75 1DT
- Phone:
- 01226321522
- Email:
- northeastmethodist@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window