Financial history BROTHERTOFT VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 514351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £1.15k £322 £4.56k £5.02k £5.17k
Total expenditure £1.95k £831 £1.35k £3.65k £3.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A