DRONFIELD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Church of the Baptist denomination. Providing place of worship and community resource.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 July 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Charles Gore | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Ruth Anna Rattigan | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Stephen Pocock | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thembelihle Jones | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Moyra Elwood Cameron | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Cyril Lax | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Smith | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Mercer Tomlinson | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Turk | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.07k | £95.00k | £125.62k | £127.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.82k | £103.34k | £119.08k | £144.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 September 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 15 September 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STUBLEY LANE
DRONFIELD
DERBYSHIRE
S18 1PE
- Phone:
- 01246291856
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window