Financial history KINGSTON UPON HULL EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 514427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.35k £4.98k £4.59k £5.28k £6.33k
Total expenditure £50 £1.60k £250 £2.60k £1.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A