UK TIME'S UP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UK Time's Up is a charity which works to (a) promote equality and diversity for the public benefit by working for the elimination of discrimination in the workplace (b) raise awareness about equality and diversity (c) cultivate a sense of favour and equality and diversity in such ways as the trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 May 2020: Standard registration
- TIME'S UP UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAME HEATHER VICTORIA RABBATTS DBE | Chair | 27 July 2018 |
|
|||||
JOANNA COSGROVE | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Jane Blair Casarotto | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adedigba Amanda Rawcliffe | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Broccoli | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate September Buckley-Sharma | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.02k | £32.64k | £247.53k | £40.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.67k | £79.11k | £116.48k | £84.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 APR 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) WORKING FOR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION IN THE WORKPLACE; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Wycombe End
BEACONSFIELD
Buckinghamshire
HP9 1NB
- Phone:
- 07790002471
- Email:
- info@timesupuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window