THE WOW FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1189880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The WOW Foundation is a charity that believes a gender equal world is desirable, possible and urgently required. Through festivals, events and more, our global movement celebrates women and girls, taking a frank look at the obstacles they face and discussing solutions for change.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sandie Okoro Chair 16 June 2021
None on record
Dame Alison Rose DBE Trustee 22 April 2025
None on record
Sandi Toksvig OBE Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
DR VANESSA JANE OGDEN Trustee 13 December 2023
None on record
Nazir Afzal Trustee 03 March 2022
THE LOWRY CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Anne-Marie Imafidon MBE Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Richard David COLLIER-KEYWOOD Trustee 13 February 2020
The Chasah Trust
Received: On time
THE INSPIRE ARTS TRUST
Received: On time
THE NGM TRUST
Received: On time
SCHOOL FOR SOCIAL ENTREPRENEURS
Received: On time
Shevaun Haviland Trustee 13 February 2020
BAREFOOT COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL UK
Received: On time
NUSRATH HASSAN Trustee 19 February 2019
None on record
BARBARA REEVES Trustee 19 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £940.51k £1.13m £1.17m £1.02m
Total expenditure £737.20k £1.04m £1.16m £1.27m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £44.60k
Income from government grants £189.17k £96.25k £46.25k £4.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £428.34k £512.04k £548.33k £394.82k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £301.43k £364.39k
Income - Charitable activities £512.17k £620.32k £323.03k £254.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £10.65k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £666.95k £916.81k £1.01m £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £70.25k £125.77k £149.17k £129.29k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.59k £12.98k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Own use assets £2.93k £3.98k £2.51k £1.03k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £536.95k £672.05k £574.27k £300.21k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £245.65k £292.02k £179.12k £151.56k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 24 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 24 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 28 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 28 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 01 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 01 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The WOW Foundation
The HKX Building
3 Pancras Square
LONDON
N1C 4AG
Phone:
07980591995