Trustees ROYAL PAVILION AND MUSEUMS TRUST
Charity number: 1186986

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael James Bedingfield DL | Chair | 06 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
James Alexander | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Edwards | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr Amanda Grimshaw BEM | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Sue Shanks Cllr | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Angela Smith | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Claire Helena Crook | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Brad Irwin MBE | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Davinder Dhillon DL | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Shaun Romain | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy John Mellor Aspinall | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
David James Charles Anderson OBE | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Avard WEEKS | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Robins Cllr | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.