THE YES FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1186521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the trustees see fit from time to time in particular but not limited to advancing the Jewish religion, the advancement of education in accordance with the Jewish religion and the alleviation of poverty among

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £48,454
Total expenditure: £1,504

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARUCH ERLICH Chair 28 March 2018
THE KASNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
David Winegarten Trustee 11 April 2022
THE KASNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
B H GUR LIMITED
Received: On time
Rabbi Avraham Mordechai Kaminer Trustee 28 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £11.73k £48.45k
Total expenditure £600 £783 £9.98k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Raffingers Llp
Unit 19-20 Bourne Court
Southend Road
WOODFORD GREEN
Essex
IG8 8HD
Phone:
02087310777
Website:

No information available