AWA DANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is, for the benefit of the general public, to promote and advance the education of the arts through the provision of dance and other training on leadership to women, including young women between 12 and 18 years of age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Elizabeth Kostic Cisneros | Chair | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE CLEMENTINE KASHGAR SPINK | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Milano Hazrati | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wyatt | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ralls | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa De Ruggeris | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arunima Kumar | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Monique Springer | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Asma Hussain | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.56k | £40.76k | £54.42k | £61.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.39k | £35.93k | £41.75k | £51.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE ARTS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF DANCE AND OTHER TRAINING TO WOMEN, INCLUDING YOUNG WOMEN BETWEEN 12 AND 18 YEARS OF AGE (‘THE BENEFICIARIES’) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Brindley Place
Brunswick Square
Birmingham
B1 2LP
- Phone:
- 07482878252
- Email:
- info@awadance.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window