Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TAVERHAM

Charity number: 1185420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £108.42k £99.15k £108.65k £95.11k £176.55k
Total expenditure £104.93k £94.12k £107.53k £98.12k £140.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A