THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TAVERHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We try to enable ordinary people to live out their faith as part of our parish community through: Worship and prayer; learning about the Gospel; and developing their knowledge and trust in Jesus. Provision of pastoral care for people living in the parish. Missionary and outreach work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 September 2019: Standard registration
- ST.EDMUNDS CHURCH, TAVERHAM (Working name)
- TAVERHAM PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PAUL SEABROOK | Chair | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Neil Larkman | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Osborne | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Ann Patricia Coker | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deidre Ingram Porter | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Howard | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham William John Harris | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Eileen Elmes | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Arthur Gentle | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Jean Hooker | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Helen Seabrook | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Louise Beevor | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marie Charnock | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Charlesworth | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Granville Routledge | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stella Edith Noons | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.42k | £99.15k | £108.65k | £95.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.93k | £94.12k | £107.53k | £98.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Taverham Lane
Taverham
Norwich
Norfolk
NR8 6SY
- Phone:
- 01603868217
- Email:
- taverhamstedmunds@gmail.com
- Website:
-
achurchnearyou.com/church/2640/
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window