THE NOTTINGHAM CITY HOSPITAL MEDICAL RESEARCH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To carry out and support medical research work at Nottingham University Hospitals NHS Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 02 March 1984: Standard registration
- 17 February 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 17 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1165397 NOTTINGHAM UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS CHARITY
- DAVID EVANS MEDICAL RESEARCH TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.03k | £63.82k | £41.04k | £27.60k | £16.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.11k | £47.45k | £30.82k | £17.69k | £9.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 JUNE 1983 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 7 FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
TO CARRY OUT MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO ILLNESS AND DISEASE OF ALL KINDS AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY PROMOTING, ESTABLISHING, EQUIPPING AND CONDUCTING A CENTRE FOR MEDICAL RESEARCH AT THE PREMISES OF THE CITY HOSPITAL, HUCKNALL ROAD, NOTTINGHAM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window