JEPSONS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of Ripon Grammar School. Provision of scholarships,bursaries,maintenance allowances and financial assistance. The provision of facilities of any kind not normally provided by the local education authority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Williams | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
SUSAN GILL | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Noake | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Karen Butler | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan Webb | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Very Reverend John Richard Dobson | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.07k | £8.23k | £8.40k | £8.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £59.82k | £17.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 May 2023 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 July 2022 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25 JAN 1927 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 DEC 1956
Charitable objects
THE FEOFFEES MAY PAY SUCH YEARLY SUM AS THEY THINK FIT, BEING NOT MORE THAN ONE-THIRD OF THE SAID NET INCOME, TO THE GOVERNORS OF RIPON GRAMMAR SCHOOL TO BE APPLIED BY THEM TOWARDS THE COST OF ALTERATIONS OF, AND REPAIRS TO, THE PREMISES OF THE SAID SCHOOL SO THAT THEY CONFORM TO THE REQUIREMENTS OF THE EDUCATION ACTS, 1944 TO 1953, AND THE REGULATIONS MADE THEREUNDER. (1) THE RESIDUE OF THE SAID NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE FEOFFEES IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:— (A) IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING, APPROVED BY THE FEOFFEES; (B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, A UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; (C) IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION; (D) IN PROVIDING, OR ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES OF ANY RIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF COACHING IN ATHLETICS, SPORTS AND GAMES, FOR BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE RECEIVING PRIMARY, SECONDARY OR FURTHER EDUCATION; AND (E) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS: PROVIDED THAT AWARDS CONSISTING OF THE PAYMENT, OR PART PAYMENT, OF FEES SHALL BE CALLED JEPSON EXHIBITIONS. (2) WITHIN THE LIMITS PRESCRIBED BY THIS SCHEME, THE FEOFFEES SHALL HAVE FULL POWER TO MAKE RULES FOR THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, OR OTHER BENEFITS, INCLUDING RULES AS TO THE VALUE AND PERIOD OF TENURE OF THE AWARDS, AND THE QUALIFICATIONS, AND METHOD OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION, OF BENEFICIARIES. (3) IN THIS CLAUSE THE EXPRESSION " BENEFICIARIES " MEANS BOYS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF RIPON WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE FEOFFEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE LOST ONE OR BOTH PARENTS, OR HAVE BEEN ABANDONED OR DESERTED BY THEIR PARENTS OR GUARDIANS, OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE DIVORCED OR SEPARATED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIPON GRAMMAR SCHOOL
16 CLOTHERHOLME ROAD
RIPON
HG4 2DG
- Phone:
- 01765602647
- Email:
- admin@ripongrammar.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window