Financial history THE LEWIS CARROLL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1187658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.76k £8.52k £2.94k £5.62k £6.85k
Total expenditure £4.49k £8.99k £8.04k £7.15k £7.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A