MINSTER LIONS CLUB OF YORK (CIO)

Charity number: 1185813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our primary aim is to help the people of York, the U.K. and elsewhere across the world, who are less fortunate. The Club supports children and youth, elderly people and those with disabilities, and all mankind. Our Rocking Rudolph schedule at Christmas is our major fundraiser.The club manufactures and distributes toiletry packs to hospitals, and collects used spectacles for recycling, and others

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £9,404
Total expenditure: £15,066

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of York
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MINSTER LIONS CLUB of YORK CIO (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert James Chair 15 October 2019
None on record
Anthony Woodcock Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
DAVID EDWARD BROUGH Trustee 15 October 2019
VISUALLY IMPAIRED SOCIAL CLUB YORK
Charity reporting is overdue by 1589 days
Marilyn Irene Bennett Trustee 15 October 2019
LIONS CLUBS INTERNATIONAL DISTRICT 105N FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Judi Anne James Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
Ian Keith Pybus Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
Geoffrey Kynaston Hawkes Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
Andrea Durston Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.49k £7.29k £11.84k £10.12k £9.40k
Total expenditure £7.00k £9.77k £8.12k £15.12k £15.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 15 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 15 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 15 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 15 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 21 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 14 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 14 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 ROUNDHILL LINK
YORK
YO30 4UN
Phone:
01904693586