INSURANCE MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Curate and interpret the educational and heritage story (past, present and future) of the national and global insurance market and related services and industries. Share the story of insurance, with all audiences, through curated exhibition content, educational outreach activities, digital resources, film content and events. An educational forum for engaging audiences in the story of insurance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of London
Governance
- 24 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reginald Ewart Brown | Chair | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Simons | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Miller | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Scott Wilkinson | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Cristina Baez Bano | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER WILLIAM SANDERS OBE | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|||||
John Charles Bissell | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH PLEASANCE CC | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | £112.63k | £76.66k | £32.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £47.16k | £89.94k | £81.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HERITAGE STORY (PAST, PRESENT AND FUTURE) OF THE NATIONAL AND GLOBAL INSURANCE MARKET AND RELATED SERVICES AND INDUSTRIES (THE 'INSURANCE MARKET'); 3.1.2 TO CREATE, ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN MUSEUMS AND/OR COLLECTIONS AND/OR ARCHIVES (IN WHATEVER FORMAT) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PURSUIT OF THAT OBJECT TO: (A) COLLECT ARTEFACTS, ARCHIVES AND HERITAGE STORIES RELATING TO THE INSURANCE MARKET IN ACCORDANCE WITH A POLICY AGREED AND PUBLISHED BY THE CHARITY FROM TIME TO TIME; (B) CURATE AND SHARE THE HERITAGE STORIES OF THE INSURANCE MARKET WITH THE PUBLIC; (C) EXHIBIT, INTERPRET AND PROVIDE ACCESS TO COLLECTIONS AND ARCHIVES; (D) EXHIBIT AND PRESERVE OBJECTS, PARTICULARLY THOSE OBJECTS ASSOCIATED WITH THE STORY AND ACTIVITIES OF THE INSURANCE MARKET; AND 3.1.3 TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE NORMALLY OR USEFULLY ASSOCIATED WITH THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Insurance Museum
C/o Chartered Insurance Institute
3rd Floor
20 Fenchurch Street
London
- Phone:
- 07970898484
- Email:
- info@insurancemuseum.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window