ROOKHOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rookhow is a 300 year old Grade II* listed Quaker Meeting House and Bunkbarn in the Rusland Valley, Cumbria. Our aim, as well as providing a gathering place for Quakers and accommodation especially for disadvantaged groups, is to be a local community resource as a venue for meetings and workshops. The surrounding ancient oak woodland is a valuable resource for learning and retreat.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 09 March 2020: CIO registration
- ROOK HOWE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Bailey | Chair | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Chapman | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Christine Gwyneth Hall Farthing | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrews | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET REBECCA MARSDEN | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Marston | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.94k | £194.92k | £117.22k | £214.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.38k | £133.61k | £150.21k | £121.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.33k | £36.00k | £19.55k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN (2) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rook Howe
Rusland
Ulverston
LA12 8LA
- Phone:
- 01229860231
- Email:
- contactrookhow@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window