CITRUS ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Citrus Arts create use the hands-on skills of circus and outdoor arts to nurture citizenship and kindness in our neighbourhood in Rhondda Cynon Taf. We ignite creativity, connecting our community to the land through getting outside to host spectacular creative experiences. We train the next generation of outdoor arts technicians and connect the energy of youth with the skills of our elders
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £34,590 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Purnell | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jamie McCallion | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Neil Pugh | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Nicolas Young | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.11k | £131.84k | £223.53k | £167.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.75k | £133.42k | £192.69k | £228.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.00k | £3.00k | £10.72k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.87k | £73.39k | £13.94k | £34.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 AUG 2016 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE CREATIVE AND ARTISTIC APPLICATION OF EXPRESSIVE ARTS IN ARTISTIC PERFORMANCE. THE PROMOTION AND TRAINING IN EXPRESSIVE ARTS AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE PUBLIC WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hopkinstown Community Hall
12 Foundry Road
Hopkinstown
PONTYPRIDD
Mid Glamorgan
CF37 2RA
- Phone:
- 01443650588
- Email:
- admin@citrusarts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window