THE SPECTACLE MAKERS' CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity 's main activity is grant-giving, principally for the relief of those in need by reason of vision impairment and/or sight loss and the advancement of study, knowledge and education in the field of optics for the public benefit, including the promotion of research in the field of optics and the publication of the useful results.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Parkins | Chair | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Priti Kotecha | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Parker | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Seema Verma | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naz Raoof | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jean Hopkins | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Miriam Conway | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rupal Lovell-Patel | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Francis Drasar | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Morris | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FELIX DUFTON | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.67k | £169.90k | £152.00k | £95.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.25k | £111.84k | £125.17k | £94.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 3.1 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF VISION IMPAIRMENT AND/OR SIGHT LOSS; AND, 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF STUDY, KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF OPTICS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF OPTICS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o WCSM
Apothecaries Hall
Black Friars Lane
LONDON
EC4V 6EL
- Phone:
- 02072362932
- Email:
- charity@spectaclemakers.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window