THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH DOWN STREET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a footprint parish offering Sunday services, bible study and prayer for people from all over London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 23 January 2020: Standard registration
- CHRIST CHURCH DOWN STREET (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matt Fuller | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jalon Peter Quinn | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Jack de Vos Meiring | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sarah Hampshire | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Catherine Millie Symes | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Elisabeth Goodden | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Helen Woollatt | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Alexandra Ilona Lucas | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Ruth Short | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kely Henry | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Maycock | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Duckering | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Rowden | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Dye | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marc Doring | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Caroline Dow | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Philip Frank Alastair Allcock | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Su Kit Chew | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.30k | £45.66k | £56.16k | £64.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.66k | £42.39k | £41.88k | £52.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church Down Street
Down Street
London
W1J 7AN
- Phone:
- 02076295885
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window