THE CANONS REGULAR OF ELTHAM CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious and other charitable work of the Canons Regular of Eltham religious order in England and Wales. In particular pastoral and religious/educational work in Roman Catholic parishes in London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
Governance
- 25 November 2019: CIO registration
- 24 July 2024: Funds received from 242484 CANONS REGULAR OF ELTHAM
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GARRY MURPHY CRE | Chair | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Price | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Father Oladele Ede Craig | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debra Elizabeth Todd | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Abram | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|||||
FR JOHN DENNIS FRICKER CRE | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £137.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £220.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2023 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2023 | 245 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 July 2023 | 610 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 July 2023 | 610 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION THROUGH THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IF AT ANY TIME THE COMMUNITY SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALL CEASE TO CARRY ON OR DIRECT OR SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE WORK THEN FOR SUCH LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOZERS
NORTH DOOR
BROADWALK HOUSE
SOUTHERNHAY WEST
EXETER
EX1 1UA
- Phone:
- 01392 207020
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window