THE HYPERMOBILITY SYNDROMES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting those living with hypermobility syndromes of all types, through advocacy, validation of the reality of living with these conditions, support towards rehabilitation and positive self-management, and individual and professional health education. This includes: Local groups, helpline, educational and social events, online support, and IS accredited information online and in print.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
39 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 December 2019: CIO registration
- 10 September 2021: Funds received from 1011063 THE HYPERMOBILITY SYNDROMES ASSOCIATION
- THE HMSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Haddon Austin | Chair | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tia Cheang | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Zoe Lomax | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Shelley Gardner | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel King | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.48k | £35.13k | £29.23k | £34.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.01k | £34.75k | £39.54k | £35.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 December 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 December 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Dec 2019 as amended on 08 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AMONG, AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF, PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HYPERMOBILITY SYNDROMES, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) PROVIDING VALIDATION, EDUCATION, REHABILITATION AND POSITIVE SELF-MANAGEMENT ADVICE FOR PEOPLE WITH HYPERMOBILITY RELATED DISORDERS AND THEIR ENTIRE SUPPORT NETWORK, INCLUDING THEIR FAMILIES, TEACHERS, FRIENDS AND COLLEAGUES. ENCOURAGING A CULTURE OF SUPPORT WHILE RAISING AWARENESS, KNOWLEDGE AND SELF-DETERMINATION. 2) IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE, AND ENABLING EFFECTIVE SELF-MANAGEMENT FOR AFFECTED INDIVIDUALS THROUGH A VARIETY OF RESOURCES, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): SELF MANAGEMENT PROGRAMS, SUPPORT GROUPS, SOCIAL MEDIA, PUBLICATIONS, HELPLINE AND SUPPORT FROM OUR EXPERT PATIENT VOLUNTEERS. 3) WORKING WITH AND EDUCATING THE RELEVANT MEDICAL, SOCIAL AND HEALTH PROFESSIONALS IN DEVELOPING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE BIOPSYCHOSOCIAL IMPACT OF HYPERMOBILITY RELATED DISORDERS FOR INDIVIDUALS AND THEIR ENTIRE SUPPORT NETWORK. 4) SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING INDIVIDUALS IN THEIR PURSUIT OF DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT, VIA SIGNPOSTING TO APPROPRIATE SERVICES WHERE NECESSARY. 5) PROVIDING AN ENVIRONMENT WHICH ENABLES PEOPLE AFFECTED BY A HYPERMOBILITY SYNDROME TO VOLUNTEER, FURTHERING THE CHARITY’S AIMS WHILST DEVELOPING THEIR OWN WORKPLACE SKILLS AND CONFIDENCE. 6) MAINTAINING THE INFORMATION STANDARD, AS WAS ACCREDITED BY NHS ENGLAND, SO AS TO ENSURE THE HIGH STANDARD OF ALL HMSA PUBLICATIONS IN WHICHEVER FORMAT DEEMED SUITABLE. 7) WORKING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO UNDERTAKE AND PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO HYPERMOBILITY RELATED DISORDERS, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. TO SEEK TO BE THE PATIENT PARTNER AND TO DISSEMINATE RESEARCH, SURVEYS AND INVESTIGATIONS WHILST MAINTAINING OUR HIGH STANDARD OF INFORMATION. 8) COLLABORATING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS ON POLICIES, STRATEGIES AND PROJECTS, WHICH ARE SYNERGISTIC WITH THE CIO’S OWN STRATEGY AND VALUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Greek Street
London
W1D 4EG
- Phone:
- 03330116388
- Email:
- info@hypermobility.org
- Website:
-
hypermobility.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window