POLISH STUDIES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1188129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the charity are to advance education of the public in, and support the academic study of, the history, literature, language, politics, economy, law, society, religion, philosophy and culture of Poland, and other areas of interest relating to Poland and its historical region.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,200
Total expenditure: £25,400

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Norman Davies Chair 24 February 2020
None on record
Professor Ania Zalewska Trustee 22 March 2021
THE SOUTH WEST HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
Christian Richard Stefan Davies Trustee 22 March 2021
None on record
Dr Stanley Bill Trustee 24 February 2020
None on record
Ranjit Edward Majumdar Trustee 24 February 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £38.89k £24.98k £4.20k
Total expenditure £0 £8.18k £25.35k £25.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FARRER & CO
65-66 LINCOLN'S INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3LH
Phone:
01865557429