THE HELP TIBET TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Help Tibet Trust works in partnership with people of Tibetan origin to promote sustainable communities and develop initiatives which support the wellbeing of the most vulnerable. Our grants' programme supports health and social care of older people; youth development and education; self-sustainable work and employment projects; and community and environmental improvement projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- India
- Nepal
Governance
- HELP TIBET (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isabelle Sarah White MBE | Chair | 28 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Karma Tsering | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARGARET MURRAY HANCOCK | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE MARY ELIZABETH COX | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSANN MARY HILL | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.70k | £42.87k | £69.39k | £109.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.80k | £59.18k | £80.08k | £79.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF TIBETAN ORIGIN WHO ARE IN NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF TIBETAN CULTURE AND HERITAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) AMONG PEOPLE OF TIBETAN ORIGIN; AND C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF TIBETAN ORIGIN PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROVIDING GRANTS TOWARDS EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT, PROJECTS, AND MATERIALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HELP TIBET
PO BOX 138
LONDON
SW13 9RN
- Phone:
- 02087488784
- Email:
- info@helptibet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window