THE STEPHEN LAWRENCE DAY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Stephen Lawrence Day Foundation will inspire a fairer and just society through Stephen's legacy engendering equality, diversity and inclusion for young people and communities globally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baroness Doreen Lawrence OBE | Chair | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Meggie | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELVIN OSEI ODURO | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Sykes | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clive Julian Driscoll | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Georgina Lawrence | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.16k | £288.73k | £164.49k | £483.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.78k | £115.03k | £144.61k | £388.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £75.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2020 as amended on 22 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF (I) EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY (II) RACIAL HARMONY AND (III) SOCIAL INCLUSION IN EACH CASE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) CELEBRATING ON AN ANNUAL BASIS THE MEMORY AND LEGACY OF STEPHEN LAWRENCE AND PROMOTING A THEME FOR EACH STEPHEN LAWRENCE DAY AMONGST THOSE IN EDUCATION AND OTHERS; (B) USING THE MEMORY AND LEGACY OF STEPHEN LAWRENCE AND OTHER MEANS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RAISE AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS SO AS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND ABOUT SOCIAL EXCLUSION SO AS TO LEAD TO BETTER OUTCOMES FOR THOSE IN, OR AT RISK, OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION; (C) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (D) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ASSOCIATED WITH THE STEPHEN LAWRENCE DAY, TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (E) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (F) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (G) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (H) PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET THE BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.?
Contact information
- Address:
-
124 CITY ROAD
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 0203 195 3946
- Email:
- info@stephenlawrenceday.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window