Westminster Seminary UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the CIO is to promote the Christian faith through training men for the ministry. We also present public lectures, that are open to all, through a monthly Saturday morning course which aims to provide training to lay members of the wider Church. We are based in Newcastle-Upon-Tyne City Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 26 May 2020: CIO registration
- WESTMINSTER PRESBYTERIAN THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ian Hamilton | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Pfeiffer | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Neil Stewart Rev | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Gilbert Dr | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Yeulett | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Wontrop | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jon David Payne | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £635.00k | £131.68k | £413.60k | £443.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.58k | £373.64k | £339.35k | £354.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £607.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £27.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £226.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 May 2020 as amended on 20 Dec 2023 as amended on 15 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL BASIS BY THE PROVISION OF THEOLOGICAL AND PASTORAL RESOURCES AND TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alderman Fenwick's House
98-100 Pilgrim Street
Newcastle Upon Tyne
NE1 6SQ
- Phone:
- 01912610526
- Email:
- contact@wpts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window