Accounts and annual returns CYLCH MEITHRIN PENTREUCHAF

Charity Number: 1187531
Charity reporting is overdue by 1201 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 August 2024 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 02 August 2024 179 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 28 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1201 days