THE BARBARA & ROLAND TEGEDER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity are twofold: 1) To apply available funds in the support of a wide range of causes, the primary areas of interest being the preservation of craftmanship, the education of people and advancement of research into humanity and the arts. 2) An incubator for initiatives and projects that fall within the Charitable Fund's primary areas of interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 May 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Roland Walter Norbert Tegeder | Chair | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adriana Natcheva | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Krishnan Narayanan | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Vera Ingrid Lisa Tegeder | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £45.55k | £32.23k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.32k | £36.22k | £12.18k | £18.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 01 October 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, HERITAGE AND CRAFTSMANSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT TO FACILITATE THE CREATION AND DISPLAY OF ART AND/OR PRESERVATION OF TRADITIONAL CRAFTS; AND (B) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
86/87
Campden Street
LONDON
W8 7EN
- Phone:
- 07528402238
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window