HULL INDEPENDENT HOUSING AID CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide advice and assitance to people in terms of housing and homelessness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 31 July 1984: Standard registration
- H I H A C (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MICHAEL DORTON | Chair | 25 October 2007 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||
GEOFFREY BREEN | Trustee | 25 October 2007 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
STEVEN JAMES RADFORD | Trustee | 25 October 2007 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
SILVIA MARGARITA MADRID | Trustee | 25 October 2007 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
DAEMON CARTWRIGHT | Trustee | 25 October 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17 | £0 | £0 | £12.36k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £987 | £388 | £425 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 APRIL 1984 AS AMENDED 21 OCTOBER 1999.
Charitable objects
1. (A) THE CENTRE IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PURPOSE OF BENEFITING THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS OF KINGSTON UPON HULL, THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE, ESPECIALLY IN HOUSING MATTERS. (B) BY RELIEVING POVERTY. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE II OF CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 HARLECH CLOSE
BRANSHOLME
HULL
HU7 5DB
- Phone:
- 01482 821242
- Email:
- andrew@dorton.karoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window