BRITISH OCULOPLASTIC SURGERY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
British Oculoplastic Surgery Society was founded in 2000 to bring together oculoplastic surgeons from the United Kingdom and Ireland. The aims of the society are to advance education, research and the quality of clinical practice in oculoplastic surgery. The society provides an opportunity for members and trainees to meet and share their expertise and offers information and advice to the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Ireland
Governance
- 04 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katya Amol Tambe | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Austin George McCormick | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Colin John Vize | Trustee | 03 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
David Verity | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.99k | £72.78k | £232.18k | £182.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.37k | £31.64k | £181.71k | £235.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PUBLIC HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A)PROMOTING HIGH QUALITY CARE OF PATIENTS UNDERGOING OCULOPLASTIC SURGERY THROUGH DEVELOPING AND PROMOTING STANDARDS OF CARE; B)PROMOTING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH RELATING TO OCULOPLASTIC SURGERY BY PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR PRESENTATION AND DISSEMINATION OF SUCH RESEARCH AND BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR STUDIES AND THEIR PUBLICATION; C)ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE FIELD OF OCULOPLASTIC SURGERY AND MEDICINE FOR MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND ASSOCIATED HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS WORKING IN THIS FIELD; D)EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO OCULOPLASTIC SURGERY; E)PROVIDING EXPERT GUIDANCE AND ADVICE ON POLICY TO APPROPRIATE BODIES CONCERNING OCULOPLASTIC SURGERY. THE FIELD OF OCULOPLASTIC SURGERY COMPRISES PERIOCULAR, PLASTIC RECONSTRUCTIVE AND AESTHETIC SURGERY, SPECIALISING IN THE EYELIDS, LACRIMAL, ORBIT, UPPER AND MID-FACE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal College Of Ophthalmologists
fao BOPSS Secretary
18 Stephenson Way
London
NW1 2HD
- Phone:
- 01482604360
- Email:
- secretary@bopss.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window