Trustees THE FRIENDS OF THE DONCASTER MUSEUMS
Charity number: 1189117
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Adgar | Chair | 07 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Nathan Turnbull | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Jones | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Marian Huby | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARTYN HOARE | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Jill Chiddey | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Stirland | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Djezzar | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.