WELLBEING IN THE WEALD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide and assist in the provision of activities and initiatives in Cranbrook and the surrounding areas to promote health and social inclusion, so that people can make connections and benefit from improved health and wellbeing. Activities include community walks, lunch clubs, choirs, volunteering, training, workshops and other social activities that bring people together on a regular basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 24 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Frank Chandler | Chair | 06 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Seamus O'Brien | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Virginia Myra Wade | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER ROBERT FREEMAN SIMPSON | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deborah Joy Jones | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dineli Charlesworth | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Mark Atchison Lawrence | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.18k | £18.52k | £19.39k | £21.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.87k | £17.39k | £21.55k | £15.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.40k | £600 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN CRANBROOK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND PRACTICAL ADVICE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING OR ASSISTING IN THE PREVENTION OF PEOPLE LIVING IN CRANBROOK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER REASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILL ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill House
Mill Lane
Sissinghurst
CRANBROOK
Kent
TN17 2HX
- Phone:
- 07961669575
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window