BETHESDA METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bethesda Methodist Church serves the Leckhampton community of Cheltenham offering a welcoming and caring approach to church activities both within the building and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £16,750 from 4 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 17 February 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Andrew Norman | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|||||
John Lee Cox | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Williams | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Gibb | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Simpson | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
TERESA ELIZABETH LLEWELLYN GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Claire Davies | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Celia Kidd | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY RICHARDS | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CLAIRE TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Brian Arthur Allan Gibb | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID BROOKE TERRY | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.79k | £180.66k | £127.32k | £143.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.28k | £136.27k | £150.07k | £136.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.25k | £7.50k | £6.00k | £16.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BETHESDA METHODIST CHURCH
GREAT NORWOOD STREET
CHELTENHAM
GL50 2AP
- Phone:
- 01242269803
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window