THE NATIONAL ACADEMY FOR SOCIAL PRESCRIBING

Charity number: 1191145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are dedicated to the advancement of social prescribing through promotion, collaboration and innovation. We work to create partnerships, across the arts, health, sports, leisure, and the natural environment to promote health and wellbeing at a national and local level. We will champion social prescribing and the work of local communities in connecting people for wellbeing.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 September 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Badyal Chair 25 February 2020
JULIES BICYCLE
Received: On time
MANCHESTER UNITED FOUNDATION
Received: On time
El-Bashir Abubakr Salem Bahaj Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Lisa Tookey Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Clova Fyfe Trustee 16 August 2024
None on record
Lady Amanda Ellingworth Trustee 16 August 2024
SOMERSET COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SIR ERNEST CASSEL EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Davina Deniszczyc Trustee 16 August 2024
None on record
Sarah Metcalfe Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Brad Gudger Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Gay Anthia Palmer Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Phoebe Ruwadzano Hitchcox Trustee 25 February 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.41m £3.16m £3.90m £2.73m
Total expenditure £3.32m £3.01m £3.37m £2.54m
Income from government contracts N/A £10.00k £57.94k N/A
Income from government grants £3.32m £3.00m £3.16m £1.90m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £12.60k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.41m £250.28k £3.59m £2.71m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £6.72k
Income - Other £0 £0 £309.02k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.32m £3.01m £3.37m £2.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £103.81k £189.75k £123.08k £82.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £468.00k £230.00k £0 £52.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £38.33k £41.27k £31.27k £12.52k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.64m £1.01m £1.25m £1.50m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.59m £821.32k £519.13k £559.02k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NAT. ACADEMY FOR SOCIAL PRESCRIBING
SOUTHBANK CENTRE
BELVEDERE ROAD
LONDON
SE1 8XX
Phone:
07749492353