Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF MONMOUTH CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 515576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £38.66k £43.31k £53.37k £35.26k £55.43k
Total expenditure £40.86k £25.73k £52.16k £41.80k £81.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.09k N/A £3.00k £2.26k £2.20k