Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DRAYTON BASSETT, FAZELEY AND MILE OAK
Charity number: 1191092

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hazel Marie Plant | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Guy Edwards | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven Croft | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Hardy | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Margaret Passey | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alexander Sinclare Keen | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Yvonne Andrews | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dawn Rammell-Sime | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Haden-Homer | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Smith | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Howard Thornley | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Jean Jennings | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Davies | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Gail Jackson | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.