SAGE DANCE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a London based dance company which provides people of 55 years plus with opportunities to develop their skills in contemporary dance and choreography and perform original works at a variety of events, festivals and venues in London and further afield. We aim to promote the benefits of dancing to our members and a wider public, whatever their age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 July 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Marea Meredith Heasman | Chair | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA JANET MORGAN | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Helen Claire Martin MA | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Mary McDonald BA | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jean Valerie Woollard | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cecil Stephen Rowe M.A. | Trustee | 12 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET WESLEY | Trustee | 12 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.11k | £14.31k | £11.60k | £7.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.61k | £10.78k | £14.66k | £9.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF DANCE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG PEOPLE AGED 55 AND OVER, BY: (A) PROVIDING TRAINING IN DANCE AND PERFORMANCE SKILLS FOR OLDER PEOPLE; AND (B) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AT FESTIVALS AND FORUMS, INCLUDING EVENTS WHICH FOCUS ON AGEING WELL. 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING AMONG PEOPLE AGED OVER 55 BY ENCOURAGING THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN DANCE AS A MEANS OF PROMOTING PHYSICAL ACTIVITY, IMPROVING COGNITIVE SKILLS AND INTERACTING SOCIALLY WITH OTHERS TO REDUCE LONELINESS AND SOCIAL ISOLATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 OAKESHOTT AVENUE
LONDON
N6 6NS
- Phone:
- 02072093593
- Email:
- info@sagedancecompany.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window