TREES FOR BERMONDSEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trees for Bermondsey works with the community, Southwark council, the GLA and others to protect, replace and increase tree canopy across Bermondsey. We improve existing places for people and nature and create new green spaces for the benefit of all, raising awareness of ways to combat the effects of climate change through our actions and encouraging and supporting others to do the same.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £21,491 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southwark
Governance
- 23 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Vaughan Ms | Chair | 23 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Leanne Werner | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hutchinson | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Readman Mr | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Hayes | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.76k | £22.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.81k | £43.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.10k | £21.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PLANTING OF TREES AND OTHER PLANTS ON STREETS AND IN PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE SPACES WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK AND IN PARTICULAR THE WARDS AROUND BERMONDSEY TO MITIGATE THE DETRIMENTAL EFFECTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE AND URBAN OVERHEATING, ENCOURAGE BIODIVERSITY AND IMPROVE AIR AND WATER QUALITY. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING BY PROMOTING TREE PLANTING AS A MEANS FOR THE PUBLIC TO LEARN ABOUT WIDER ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES SUCH AS: SUSTAINABILITY, CLIMATE CHANGE, ECOLOGY AND THE MITIGATING NEED FOR TREES. 3. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL ENHANCEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF STREETS AND PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE SPACES AROUND BERMONDSEY AND THE WIDER BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, BY THE PLANTING OF TREES AND SECURING THEIR GUARDIANSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
107 GRANGE ROAD
LONDON
SE1 3BW
- Phone:
- 02072522105
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window