Financial history THE UNITED CHARITIES OF ABEL COLLIN

Charity number: 1188997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £4.76m £441.80k £486.15k £503.55k
Total expenditure £0 £357.92k £363.63k £532.69k £540.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £69.47k N/A N/A £70.19k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £309.01k N/A N/A £396.57k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £44.94k N/A N/A £36.78k
Income - Other N/A £4.34m N/A N/A £141.87k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £357.23k N/A N/A £539.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A £24.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £694 N/A N/A £1.25k