THE HOPE TRUST OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust seeks to advance the Christian faith through partnership with organisations that provide relief to those in need and that promote Christian education. For example, the Trust currently employs a debt centre manager in partnership with Christians Against Poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 25 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Georgina Prineppi | Chair | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Butterworth | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|||||
James William Paterson | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Sylvia Charlotte Pillar | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Turnbull | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.46k | £76.14k | £71.78k | £65.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.54k | £37.35k | £66.17k | £72.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK OR ABROAD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE SUPPORT OF CHARITABLE OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHICH, OR INDIVIDUALS WHO, ARE INVOLVED IN ANY OF THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES AS AN EXPRESSION OF THE CHRISTIAN LIFE AND FAITH: (1) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; (2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (3) THE PROMOTION OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION AND FAITH THROUGH EVANGELISM, PREACHING, BIBLE TEACHING OR TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-2 Roger Bacon Lane
Oxford
OX1 1QE
- Phone:
- 01865240438
- Email:
- andrew.turnbull@stebbes.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window