THE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST (THE BMMT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose is to hold, conserve, enhance, interpret and exhibit the regimental collections of the former auxiliary military forces raised in Buckinghamshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 26 May 2020: CIO registration
- 30 July 2020: Funds received from 293593 BUCKINGHAMSHIRE MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST
- THE BUCKINGHAMSIRE MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST ("THE BMMT") (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Col Derek Alexander Plews BA, MA, VR | Chair | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Countess Elizabeth Howe | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Alastair James Hay Murray | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Major Michael Joseph Hrycak | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen James Berridge | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Captain Courtenay Cumberland Coade | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN BARLOW SHELDON | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Major General Gregory Stephen Smith CB QVRM TD | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|||||||
Lt Col Simon Edward Wilkinson FNAEA, DL | Trustee | 16 September 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.71k | £4.73k | £3.77k | £8.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.69k | £7.89k | £5.47k | £2.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 May 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 TO HOLD, CONSERVE, ENHANCE, INTERPRET AND EXHIBIT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE REGIMENTAL COLLECTIONS OF THE FORMER AUXILIARY MILITARY FORCES RAISED IN THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE (BEING THE AREA DEFINED AS THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE PRIOR TO THE REORGANISATION FOLLOWING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT ACT 1972); AND 3.2 TO PROMOTE, RESEARCH AND UNDERTAKE ANY ANCILLARY CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUCKINGHAM TOURIST CENTRE
OLD GAOL
MARKET HILL
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 1JX
- Phone:
- 01736762929
- Email:
- ian.beckett@bmmt.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window