WESTERN SAHARA SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Western Sahara Support Group raises funds to support projects that improve the quality of life of people living within the Western Saharan refugee camps, based in the harsh desert conditions of southern Algeria. We organise a range of fundraising events and also apply to individual trust funds,individuals and donor organisations to enable the projects agreed to come to fruition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Manchester City
- Algeria
- Western Sahara
Governance
- 03 September 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
andy pitts | Chair | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Seneda Nassir Ali | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack O'Neill | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Pauline Pitts | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Billington | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Pettyfer | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
OWEN TYLER COOPER | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.45k | £33.53k | £19.72k | £15.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.16k | £32.03k | £19.86k | £14.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 September 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF NEED OF THE SAHRAWI PEOPLE IN THE WESTERN SAHARA REFUGEE CAMPS IN ALGERIA (THE CAMPS) BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO SUPPORT PROJECTS TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 BRIGHTON AVENUE
MANCHESTER
M19 2JQ
- Phone:
- 07847523192
- Email:
- growhopesahrawi@outlook.com
- Website:
-
growhopesahrawi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window