Trustees LIONS CLUBS INTERNATIONAL DISTRICT 105SW FOUNDATION (CIO)

Charity number: 1189573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Stuart Moore Chair 01 July 2022
None on record
FRANK GEOFFREY COLLINS Trustee 24 April 2025
None on record
Mark Symes Trustee 24 April 2025
FROME RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITIES
Received: On time
NURSES HOME FUND
Received: On time
FROME LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
Dr Philip Kessell Bunt Trustee 22 July 2024
NEWQUAY TOWAN BLYSTRA LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
Christine Walker Rowe Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Richard Allen Trustee 03 January 2024
BUDLEIGH SALTERTON LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
David Atkins Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
CHRISTOPHER DAVID FORD Trustee 01 January 2023
STREET BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
GLASTONBURY & STREET LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF STRODE THEATRE
Received: On time
Judith John Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
James Mathers Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record