THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHERRY HINTON, ST ANDREW

Charity Number: 1189269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Andrew's is the Church of England parish church for the ecclesiastical parish of Cherry Hinton. We provide religious services and pastoral care to the wider community and to our regular congregation. We support the schools in our parish with assemblies, pastoral care and religious education activities. We work in partnership with other local community groups to provide services of many kinds.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £121,371
Total expenditure: £124,952

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST ANDREW'S CHERRY HINTON (Working name)
  • ST ANDREW'S CHURCH, CHERRY HINTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Karin Lee Voth Harman Chair 13 September 2016
None on record
Michael Richard Sanders Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Rev Jon Sanders Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Robin Carl Greenwood Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Stephen J Burden Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Ian Andrew Stevens Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Rev Deborah Perrin Ford Trustee 29 September 2017
THE CAMBRIDGE FRIENDSHIP TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Peter Valdis Ievins Trustee 29 September 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £162.14k £141.07k £121.72k £121.37k
Total expenditure £120.09k £133.91k £107.28k £124.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £1.64k £916 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. ANDREWS CHURCH
COLDHAMS LANE
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3JS
Phone:
01223242954
Website:

standrews-cherryhinton.org.uk