HALESWORTH TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Halesworth Tennis Club is open to both members and the public to play tennis. Members and the public can book courts on line. We are a small friendly club and we welcome new members of all standards and have a full range of coaching activities for all age groups to both improve their game and overall fitness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 19 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Thomas THACKRAY | Chair | 06 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Lyn Roper | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benedict John Sharratt | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael George Davis | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael George Binder | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Teresa Claire SUMMERS | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Rosamund BINDER | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.24k | £6.72k | £4.59k | £6.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.03k | £8.22k | £2.63k | £4.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 160 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HALESWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TENNIS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Halesworth Tennis Club
Dairy Hill
Bungay Road
Halesworth
Suffolk
IP19 8JS
- Phone:
- 01986781468
- Email:
- pamfenner@me.com
- Website:
-
halesworthtennisclub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window