THE BRYNTAIL COTTAGE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides self catering accommodation in mid Wales for disadvantaged schools and youth groups from Birmingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Powys
Governance
- 23 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catrin Sarah Meredith | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
LT COL NEIL MACKINTOSH | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Christopher Etheridge | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Adrian Peter Murphy | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Fryer | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bryan Hiorns | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Marano | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.52k | £138.84k | £12.11k | £9.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.30k | £13.77k | £8.28k | £14.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AFFORDABLE ACCOMMODATION AND FACILITIES FOR EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TILE CROSS ACADEMY
GRESSEL LANE
BIRMINGHAM
B33 9UF
- Phone:
- 01218033854
- Email:
- bryntail@tilecross.academy
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window