AFRICAN WOMEN EMPOWERMENT FORUM (AWEF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AWEF empowerment process seek to give African Women, Refugees and Asylum Seekers and their children the power of making decisions on their own, through having access to information and resources that will enhance them in making proper decision, grant them options from which they can make choices for themselves, then having the abilities to exercise assertiveness within collective decision-making .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Olga Maria Rebeiro Guedes BAILEY | Chair | 09 June 2006 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roda Madziva | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Azza Omer | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Kamau | Trustee | 23 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Faith Gakanje-Ajala | Trustee | 09 June 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £11.17k | £18.95k | £53.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £11.17k | £622 | £36.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE, ASYLUM SEEKER, AND MIGRANT STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN NEW COMMUNITIES IN NOTTINGHAM CITY, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND EAST MIDLANDS. IN SUPPORT THEREOF ACCORDING TO STATUS PROVIDE: TRAINING IN BASIC SKILLS TO HELP FIND WORK; GENERAL EDUCATION INCLUDING LANGUAGE SKILLS; ACCESS HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICES AND FACILITATE INTEGRATION IN SUCH A WAY THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY AND WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
IN NOTTINGHAM CITY, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND EAST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
African Women Empowerment Forum
UNIT 2, VICTORIA COURT
KENT STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 3LZ
- Phone:
- 0774158165
- Email:
- info@awef.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window